ST MARY'S SCHOOL PTA, BATH

Charity number: 1162005
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 17 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 20 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 20 March 2021 263 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 20 March 2021 629 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 31 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required