ST MARY'S SCHOOL PTA, BATH

Charity number: 1162005
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £18.14k £8.30k £12.20k £3.28k £1.43k
Total expenditure £11.98k £12.14k £5.34k £245 £16.26k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A