READ FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1160256
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £2.30m £2.23m £2.75m £3.11m £4.89m
Total expenditure £2.13m £2.52m £2.43m £3.46m £3.79m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.27m £2.22m £2.74m £3.09m £4.87m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £31.44k £7.36k £9.51k £9.30k £20.93k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.44k £3.13k £2.44k £2.30k £2.34k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.60m £1.94m £1.86m £2.62m £3.00m
Expenditure - Raising funds £528.86k £582.16k £575.21k £845.33k £795.15k
Expenditure - Governance £6.22k £6.00k £4.86k £4.55k £4.46k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.23m £1.51m £1.43m £0 £2.27m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0