READ FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1160256
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sarah Salam Trustee 01 May 2019 None on record
HAROON RASHID Trustee 30 January 2015
I WAQF CHARITABLE TRUST Recently registered
QURANIC ARABIC FOUNDATION Received: On time
HAFSA FOUNDATION Received: 19 days late
IGIVE Received: On time
RIZWAN RASHID Trustee 13 August 2016
I WAQF CHARITABLE TRUST Recently registered
IGIVE Received: On time
Asif Ansari Trustee 12 January 2019 None on record
Dr YAQUB HUSSAIN Chair 30 January 2015 None on record
Dr USMAN CHOUDRY Trustee 06 May 2017 None on record