MOULSHAM LODGE COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our vision is to improve the life of residents in, Moulsham Lodge & Tile Kiln. These are our areas of benefit and represent an area that have been without facilities for a some time. We would like to help local residents make a positive change to their lifestyle by offering opportunities for educational, social and recreational activities for people of all ages and ethnic backgrounds.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 29 May 2015: Standard registration
- MLCT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK SPRINGETT | Chair | 30 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Baines | Trustee | 04 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Manuel Ferreira Da Silva | Trustee | 04 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Brown | Trustee | 04 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jane Gutteridge | Trustee | 05 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
COLIN BOOTH | Trustee | 30 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
LAUREN SMITH | Trustee | 30 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.69k | £6.62k | £18.75k | £18.01k | £17.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.98k | £27.92k | £37.60k | £20.20k | £8.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £9.58k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 23 October 2024 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 07 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 05 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 19 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 12 October 2020 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17/11/2010
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF MOULSHAM LODGE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: 3.1 TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS 3.2 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, TRAINING AND RETRAINING 3.3 TO PROMOTE THE HEALTH AND WELL-BEING OF THE MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Community Station
99 Gloucester Avenue
Chelmsford
Essex
CM2 9EL
- Phone:
- 07411808731
- Email:
- enquiries@mlct.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window