Accounts and annual returns SHERBURN HILL HUB

Charity number: 1161236
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 25 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 29 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 03 April 2019 62 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 03 April 2019 62 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 01 February 2018 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 01 February 2018 1 days late Download Open in new window