Financial history SHERBURN HILL HUB

Charity number: 1161236
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £4.01k £0 £278 £7.72k £83.98k
Total expenditure £169 £1.42k £3.98k £2.42k £11.75k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £400 N/A £260 N/A £74.41k