KIDDERMINSTER FOODBANK

Charity number: 1159223
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2021 08 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 08 December 2021 On time
Annual return 30 April 2020 03 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 03 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2019 25 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 25 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2018 29 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 29 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2017 07 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 26 January 2018 On time Download