Accounts and annual returns THE RYE WURLITZER ACADEMY

Charity number: 1161821
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 28 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 28 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 30 March 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 31 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 31 March 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 06 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 06 February 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 22 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

22 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window