Financial history THE RYE WURLITZER ACADEMY

Charity number: 1161821
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £17.02k £16.54k £16.75k £17.45k £16.75k
Total expenditure £16.77k £18.55k £16.28k £14.84k £16.28k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A