Financial history PARK LANE STABLES RDA

Charity number: 1161306
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021
Total gross income £22.52k £41.98k £76.71k £143.82k £1.87m
Total expenditure £22.15k £46.24k £81.67k £106.12k £146.71k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £5.00k £800 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.69m
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £118.49k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £61.54k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £6
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £129.50k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £6.05k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £17.20k