THE HUB@BA15

Charity number: 1160807
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANGELA JANE HILL Trustee 15 November 2016 None on record
DAVID RAYMOND JEWELL Trustee 15 November 2016 None on record
Joan Alison Wells Trustee 01 March 2020 None on record
JAMES KENNETH CLARKE Trustee 25 March 2015 None on record
JOHN ANTHONY HUTCHINSON Trustee 01 March 2015 None on record
Michael Roberts Trustee 22 October 2020 None on record
LAURENCE BROWN Chair 25 March 2015 None on record
Philip Secretan Trustee 12 January 2021 None on record