RUGBY DEMENTIA SUPPORT

Charity number: 1160535
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sally Elizabeth Robbins Trustee 14 February 2020
BARBY TOWN LANDS AND EDUCATIONAL CHARITY Received: On time
Bernie Bayliss Trustee 02 June 2017 None on record
LIZ ROGERSON Trustee 28 September 2018 None on record
RAY PICKERING Trustee 05 June 2015 None on record
JANE MUERS Chair 05 June 2015 None on record
JANET LILIAN WATLING Trustee 05 June 2015 None on record
Raymond Victor Walsh Trustee 30 August 2019 None on record
Lucy Ann Battison Trustee 30 August 2019 None on record
SUE MYERS Trustee 05 June 2015
British Friends of Quaker Council for European Affairs Received: On time