Accounts and annual returns THE BURKE-VEITCH SCHOLARSHIP

Charity number: 505359
Charity reporting is overdue by 167 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 167 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 167 days
Annual return 01 April 2022 13 March 2023 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2021 31 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2020 12 March 2021 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2019 12 March 2021 405 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2019 Not Required