BRITISH SOCIETY FOR MIDDLE EASTERN STUDIES

Charity number: 1161206
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 18 March 2020 139 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 16 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 03 November 2017 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required