BRITISH SOCIETY FOR MIDDLE EASTERN STUDIES

Charity number: 1161206
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

21 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Sharri Plonski Trustee 13 January 2020
BRITISH SOCIETY FOR MIDDLE EASTERN STUDIES Received: On time
Lucy Sarah Garbett Trustee 18 March 2021
BRITISH SOCIETY FOR MIDDLE EASTERN STUDIES Received: On time
Dr Zahra Tizro Kolangarani Trustee 24 June 2019
BRITISH SOCIETY FOR MIDDLE EASTERN STUDIES Received: On time
Dr Lewis Edward Turner Trustee 30 June 2020
BRITISH SOCIETY FOR MIDDLE EASTERN STUDIES Received: On time
Dr Paola Teresa Carla Rivetti Trustee 13 January 2020
BRITISH SOCIETY FOR MIDDLE EASTERN STUDIES Received: On time
Dr Alam Bachari Saleh Trustee 14 July 2016
BRITISH SOCIETY FOR MIDDLE EASTERN STUDIES Received: On time
Dr Feras Alkabani Trustee 30 June 2020
BRITISH SOCIETY FOR MIDDLE EASTERN STUDIES Received: On time
Dr Hanem El-Farahaty Trustee 30 June 2020
BRITISH SOCIETY FOR MIDDLE EASTERN STUDIES Received: On time
Dr Malaka Shwaikh Trustee 13 January 2020
BRITISH SOCIETY FOR MIDDLE EASTERN STUDIES Received: On time
Dr LLOYD RIDGEON PhD Trustee 07 August 2012
BRITISH SOCIETY FOR MIDDLE EASTERN STUDIES Received: On time
Dr Rafeef Ziadah Trustee 13 January 2020
BRITISH SOCIETY FOR MIDDLE EASTERN STUDIES Received: On time
Dr Teodora Todorova Trustee 13 January 2020
BRITISH SOCIETY FOR MIDDLE EASTERN STUDIES Received: On time
Professor Tim Jacoby Trustee 26 June 2018
BRITISH SOCIETY FOR MIDDLE EASTERN STUDIES Received: On time
Dr Marianna Charountaki Trustee 30 June 2020
BRITISH SOCIETY FOR MIDDLE EASTERN STUDIES Received: On time
Marral Shamshiri-Fard Trustee 13 January 2020
BRITISH SOCIETY FOR MIDDLE EASTERN STUDIES Received: On time
Dr Nicola Perugini Trustee 13 January 2020
BRITISH SOCIETY FOR MIDDLE EASTERN STUDIES Received: On time
Dr Giuseppe Andrea Teti Trustee 24 June 2019
BRITISH SOCIETY FOR MIDDLE EASTERN STUDIES Received: On time
Professor John Terrell Chalcraft Trustee 26 June 2018
BRITISH SOCIETY FOR MIDDLE EASTERN STUDIES Received: On time
PROFESSOR JAMES DICKINS Trustee 14 July 2016
BRITISH SOCIETY FOR MIDDLE EASTERN STUDIES Received: On time
Professor Haleh Afshar Trustee 08 November 2019
BRITISH SOCIETY FOR MIDDLE EASTERN STUDIES Received: On time
Professor Neve Gordon Trustee 13 January 2020
BRITISH SOCIETY FOR MIDDLE EASTERN STUDIES Received: On time