Accounts and annual returns RAPID RELIEF TEAM

Charity number: 1161586
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 07 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 07 September 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 30 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 30 April 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2018 29 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 29 April 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2017 28 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 28 April 2018 On time Download Open in new window