Accounts and annual returns BROTHERHOOD REACH

Charity number: 1162017
Charity reporting is overdue by 1647 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 06 January 2024 09 April 2025 154 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 January 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 186 days
Annual return 06 January 2023 09 April 2025 520 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 January 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 552 days
Annual return 06 January 2022 09 April 2025 885 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 January 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 917 days
Annual return 06 January 2021 09 April 2025 1250 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 January 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1282 days
Annual return 06 January 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1647 days
Accounts and TAR 06 January 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1647 days