Financial history OPTIONS FOR INTERNATIONAL HEALTH

Charity number: 1160066
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £324.94k £1.44m £2.57m £1.90m £1.35m
Total expenditure £324.94k £1.44m £2.57m £1.90m £1.35m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £1.44m £0 £1.90m £1.35m
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 £2.57m £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £1.44m £2.57m £1.90m £1.35m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £1.90m £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0