BASLOW VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1162216
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 08 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 08 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 28 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 19 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 17 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 21 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 21 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 05 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 05 December 2017 On time Download