BASLOW VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1162216
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Margaret Ashton Trustee 18 June 2018 None on record
Alison Jane Haynes Trustee 15 June 2020 None on record
Sheila Bailey Trustee 15 June 2020 None on record
Judith Parker Trustee 18 June 2018 None on record
Dr John Patrick George Mailer Trustee 17 June 2019 None on record
John Petty Trustee 17 June 2019 None on record
Richard Plumb Trustee 02 August 2021 None on record
David Arthur Tucker Trustee 17 June 2019 None on record
Doreen Gridley Trustee 17 June 2019 None on record
Rev MICHAEL VICTOR GILBERT Trustee 01 October 2015
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LAWRENCE, EYAM Received: On time
LESLEY JUNE POWELL Trustee 17 June 2019
BASLOW SENIOR CITIZEN'S CLUB Received: On time
Charlotte Fionnguala Margaret Cooper Trustee 15 June 2020 None on record
Dr Julian Newton Trustee 21 June 2021 None on record