HAWKS FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Youth Football Club
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
Total income includes £2,896 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 08 January 2015: Standard registration
- HAWKS & SUPPORTERS FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAMES BAMBRIDGE | Chair | 08 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Luke Doughty | Trustee | 24 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Chandler | Trustee | 05 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Carla Bambridge | Trustee | 08 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.12k | £9.33k | £19.99k | £12.69k | £20.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.93k | £10.41k | £21.18k | £10.54k | £15.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.90k | N/A | £1.92k | N/A | £2.90k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 08 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 08 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 16 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 FEB 2014 AS AMENDED ON 06/12/2014 as amended on 09 May 2021 as amended on 14 Mar 2022 as amended on 01 Jun 2024
Charitable objects
The Charitable Objects of the Club are: a) To advance the amateur sport of association football. b) To promote community participation in healthy recreation by providing facilities in the town of Kettering for playing Association football. c) To provide and assist in providing facilities for sport, recreation and other leisure time occupation of people who have need of such facilities because of their youth, age, infirmity or disablement, poverty, or social and economic circumstances or for the public at large in the interests of social welfare and with the object of improving their conditions of life. d) To advance the education and wellbeing of children and young people whether or not undergoing formal education. e) To promote the principle of “Sport for All”, with equality of opportunity regardless of ability or skill, in a safe environment played within the Spirit of Sport, as well as the Laws of the games. f) To act with fairness and integrity with the aim of setting high standards of conduct in the sport.
Contact information
- Address:
-
62 Northampton Road
Kettering
NN15 7JX
- Phone:
- 01536511049
- Email:
- info@hawksfc.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window