DAUBENEY PARENTS, TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1159228
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 September 2020 12 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2019 10 August 2020 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2018 08 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 31 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 07 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required