Financial history THE SOMA LEO FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1159964
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £12.92k £29.29k £9.45k £24.62k £13.05k
Total expenditure £18.67k £20.19k £17.55k £16.85k £18.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A