FULHAM REACH BOAT CLUB

Charity number: 1161813
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £407.03k £435.40k £927.25k £843.86k £738.23k
Total expenditure £418.21k £483.94k £622.11k £766.41k £822.84k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £628.17k £517.90k £463.76k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £10.97k £17.39k £6.31k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £288.07k £308.52k £268.15k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £35 £40 £0
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £611.72k £751.93k £807.90k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £10.39k £14.47k £14.94k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0