FULHAM REACH BOAT CLUB

Charity number: 1161813
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Laura Lee Trustee 16 April 2020
ROYAL FREE CANCERKIN BREAST CANCER TRUST Received: On time
MAGGIE KESWICK JENCKS CANCER CARING CENTRES TRUST ENGLAND Received: On time
Charles Pretzlik Trustee 17 February 2021 None on record
MARK ELGAR Trustee 04 April 2014 None on record
James Barlow Trustee 15 March 2018 None on record
DAVID FITZHERBERT Chair 04 April 2014 None on record
Rachael Henshilwood Trustee 16 March 2018
LORD WANDSWORTH COLLEGE Received: On time