PENNINE ANIMAL WELFARE SOCIETY

Charity number: 1159544
Charity reporting is up to date (33 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £24.51k £30.97k £47.42k £55.35k £39.81k
Total expenditure £23.23k £31.89k £42.57k £43.63k £48.93k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.00k £1.20k £2.03k N/A N/A