THE CONGREGATION OF THE SISTERS OF CHARITY OF SAINT LOUIS CIO

Charity number: 1160898
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £172.17k £164.31k £737.87k £174.08k £158.99k
Total expenditure £232.19k £192.31k £460.78k £198.77k £190.61k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £649.09k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £88.78k N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £568.18k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £460.78k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £6.85k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £384.01k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A