IVEGILL NURSERY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides access to nursery education in a rural area. Trained and qualified early years practitioners work with children to support them in achieving the early learning goals for the seven areas of learning and development within the EYFS. Staffing ratios that are required by law are adhered to. The opportunities are tailored to meet children's personal learning and development needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income includes £49,214 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Cumbria
Governance
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stacey Louise CREIGHTON | Chair | 24 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Kerry Anne Hayton | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Margaret Sims | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH ADA BLAKE | Trustee | 13 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr ELIZABETH JANE RICKERBY | Trustee | 13 November 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.50k | £58.92k | £56.17k | £42.31k | £57.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.53k | £49.38k | £52.22k | £54.65k | £56.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £40.25k | £48.42k | £47.65k | £29.69k | £49.21k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 24 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 24 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 21 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 21 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 12 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 12 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 02 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 02 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 27 Nov 2014
Charitable objects
ESTABLISHING AND MAINTAINING IN PERPETUITY IN ACCORDANCE WITH AND SUBJECT TO THE POWERS AND PROVISIONS OF THE TRUST DEED A DAY NURSERY FOR PROMOTING THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF CHILDREN UNDER THE AGE OF SIX YEARS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Linton Ghyll
Ivegill
CARLISLE
CA4 0PH
- Phone:
- 01697473200
- Email:
- ivegillnursery@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window