Financial history FAIR WAYS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1159854
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021
Total gross income £11.17m £12.39m £13.38m £14.97m £2.91m
Total expenditure £10.69m £11.55m £12.71m £14.33m £1.41m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A £13.20m £14.80m N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £165.37k £130.87k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £245.18k £180.58k £159.16k £2.46m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £11.17m £12.14m £13.20m £14.80m £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.01k £2.46k £6.85k £4.79k £424.87k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £26.12k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £10.69m £11.55m £12.71m £14.33m £1.41m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £208.11k £211.07k £211.37k £206.99k £12.83k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £32.65k £1.08m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0