THE RED TRUST BUSHEY

Charity number: 1161424
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £24.88k £14.89k £24.34k £22.80k £22.34k
Total expenditure £8.63k £19.24k £19.08k £22.84k £16.88k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £2.51k £5.00k £5.00k £5.98k