THE SCREEN FILM COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1161792
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 01 May 2021 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 01 May 2021 1 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 19 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 19 March 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 07 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 07 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 23 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 28 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

28 April 2017 On time Download