THE SCREEN FILM COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1161792
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £31.10k £22.70k £41.96k £40.90k £46.81k
Total expenditure £15.34k £20.52k £19.88k £52.93k £54.48k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £9.92k N/A £23.45k