ADVANTAGE FOR CHILDREN LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve the needs of children and young people who are sick, convalescent, disabled, handicapped or infirm by providing items and equipment, services or facilities calculated to relieve their needs which are not readily available from other sources.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 April 2015: Standard registration
- 09 May 2018: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2015 | 01 June 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/11/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 14/03/2015
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 25 THROUGH PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. 2) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED OR INFIRM BY PROVIDING ITEMS AND EQUIPMENT, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCUALTED TO RELIEVE THEIR NEEDS WHICH ARE NOT READILY AVAILABLE FROM OTHER SOURCES.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window