TALK THE TALK

Charity number: 1161251
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 25 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 25 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 13 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 13 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 10 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 10 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 16 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 16 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 18 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 15 August 2017 46 days late Download