CORNWALL MUSIC SERVICE TRUST

Charity number: 1159622
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 06 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 06 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 13 July 2020 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 13 July 2020 13 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 15 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 15 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 27 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 27 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 04 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 24 January 2017 On time Download