CORNWALL MUSIC SERVICE TRUST

Charity number: 1159622
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PAUL KNEEBONE Trustee 16 October 2014 None on record
Robin Bates Trustee 26 April 2021 None on record
DAVID WILLIAM FRYER Chair 15 December 2014
THE CHARLES CAUSLEY TRUST Received: On time
REBECCA MARY JANE THOMAS Trustee 16 October 2014 None on record
ANDREW SAMLER GORDON-BROWN Trustee 16 October 2014
THE TRURO SCHOOL FORMER PUPILS' ASSOCIATION Received: On time
Jacqueline Scarborough Trustee 30 September 2019 None on record
Elizabeth Sibley Trustee 30 September 2019 None on record
Jacqueline Brant Trustee 26 April 2021 None on record
Andy Johnson Trustee 02 November 2020 None on record
JUDITH MARGARET BAILEY Trustee 16 October 2014
WALL MUSIC FESTIVAL SOCIETY Received: On time
Daniel Iain Solly Trustee 29 January 2019 None on record
ALAN THOMAS LANE RETALLACK Trustee 16 October 2014 None on record