CYMDEITHAS COEDWIG CYMUNED PONTRHYDFENDIGAID COMMUNITY WOODLAND ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1162376
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £3.28k £5.22k £3.73k £1.31k £533
Total expenditure £2.84k £2.09k £3.58k £1.52k £436
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.48k £0 N/A N/A N/A