NATIONAL COASTWATCH INSTITUTION

Charity number: 1159975
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Philip Styles Trustee 19 May 2021 None on record
Clive Pouncey Chair 27 April 2019 None on record
IAN WHALLEY Trustee 16 January 2015 None on record
Jonathan Rothwell Trustee 22 April 2017 None on record
LESLEY SUDDES Trustee 16 January 2015 None on record
David Crozier Trustee 21 April 2018 None on record
Dr Chris Aps Trustee 19 May 2021 None on record
TIM COLQUHOUN Trustee 23 April 2016 None on record
Graeme Gordon Trustee 01 January 2022
THE GRG GENERAL RELIEF FUND Recently registered
Stephen John Hand Trustee 25 April 2020 None on record