BISHOP GROSSETESTE UNIVERSITY STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1159461
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Abraham Hall Trustee 01 July 2019 None on record
John James O'Donoghue Trustee 01 February 2016 None on record
Erin Niamh Bell Trustee 01 July 2020
BISHOP GROSSETESTE UNIVERSITY Received: On time
Jordan William Tyson Fane Trustee 01 July 2019 None on record
SAM THOMPSON Trustee 01 August 2018 None on record
DR Claire Thomson Trustee 15 June 2017 None on record
Nuala Barczak Trustee 01 July 2020 None on record
Kaylee Hempenstall Trustee 01 July 2019 None on record
Kyle Walker Trustee 23 October 2020 None on record
Bob Walder Trustee 06 November 2017 None on record