LEUVA PATIDAR SAMAJ (SURAT, NAVSARI & VALSAD DISTRICT) OF LEICESTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Leuva Patidar Samaj of Leicester (LPSL) is a Hindu based community based in Leicester whose purpose is to further the Hindu Religion in its community by organising and funding religious events. LPSL also provides relief of poverty to members in the community through various activities, including elderly lunch clubs, organised gatherings, sports, recreation and social support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 07 December 2015: Standard registration
- LPSL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SURENDRA KUMAR RAMA PATEL MBA | Chair | 05 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Anandkumar Vithalbhai Patel | Trustee | 05 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Savan Kirtikumar Patel | Trustee | 05 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Raksha Patel | Trustee | 05 December 2021 |
|
|||||
MITESH PATEL | Trustee | 05 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Nilesh Kumar Patel | Trustee | 05 December 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.32k | £2.69k | £2.28k | £22.44k | £35.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.84k | £2.24k | £7.36k | £27.72k | £31.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £300 | N/A | N/A | £288 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 11 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 NOV 2012 AS AMENDED ON 22/11/2015 as amended on 05 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
OUR MAIN ACTIVITIES (OBJECTS), AS LISTED IN OUR CONSTITUTION, ARE: (1)THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE HINDU RELIGION, CULTURE AND UNITY, IN PARTICULAR AMONG THE HINDU COMMUNITY IN THE LEICESTER AREA KNOWN AS LEUVA PATIDAR WHICH ORIGINATES FROM THE SURAT, NAVSARI AND VALSAD DISTRICTS OF INDIA (HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE COMMUNITY'). (2) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS AMONG THE MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY. (3) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONG CHILDREN AND ADULTS OF THE COMMUNITY. (4) THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF THE COMMUNITY AND IN PARTICULAR OF MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS APPLICATION, PLEASE NOTE THAT THE COMMUNITY SHALL ALSO BE REFERRED TO AS LPS LEICESTER.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
83 FOREST HOUSE LANE
LEICESTER FOREST EAST
LEICESTER
LE3 3NU
- Phone:
- 07806602848
- Email:
- secretary@lpsleicester.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window