Trustees MUMBLES COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1164553

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIMON TSE | Chair | 25 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Catherine Rees | Trustee | 12 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Deeks | Trustee | 31 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Michael Wilson | Trustee | 25 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Peter Charles Bray | Trustee | 26 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER PARKIN MBE | Trustee | 25 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN RODWELL | Trustee | 25 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL PODBIELSKI | Trustee | 25 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
CLIVE DAVIES | Trustee | 25 November 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.