AXMINSTER SKATEPARK

Charity number: 1161283
Charity reporting is up to date (111 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 February 2021 111 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 19 February 2021 111 days late Download
Annual return 31 May 2019 15 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 15 March 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 04 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 04 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 22 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 22 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 07 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 07 October 2016 On time Download