HAINWORTH WOOD COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1161769
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 06 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 10 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 10 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 15 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 15 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 25 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 25 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 20 June 2017 140 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 25 January 2017 On time Download