50001 YOUTH TRAINING TRUST

Charity number: 1160783
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £21.88k £2.32k £5.14k £4.78k £3.26k
Total expenditure £13.52k £6.95k £5.87k £2.85k £4.82k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A