Financial history FISHBURN ACADEMY BAND

Charity number: 1160086
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021
Total gross income £11.91k £4.14k £5.86k £2.47k £552
Total expenditure £10.77k £4.60k £5.63k £2.09k £91
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £7.61k N/A £3.41k N/A N/A