Accounts and annual returns ARDHNARESHWAR LOK KALYAN

Charity number: 1164617
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 02 February 2021 19 March 2022 107 days late
Accounts and TAR 02 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 02 February 2020 15 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 02 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 02 February 2019 15 March 2020 104 days late
Accounts and TAR 02 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 02 February 2018 03 December 2018 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 02 February 2018 Not Required
Annual return 02 February 2017 01 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 02 February 2017 Not Required