Financial history ARDHNARESHWAR LOK KALYAN

Charity number: 1164617
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 02/02/2017 02/02/2018 02/02/2019 02/02/2020 02/02/2021
Total gross income £13.35k £11.95k £7.76k £7.00k £5.11k
Total expenditure £5.20k £6.54k £7.50k £7.55k £1.97k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A