Accounts and annual returns JASMINE ROAD COMMUNITY GARDENS

Charity number: 1162495
Charity reporting is overdue by 548 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2022 Overdue Overdue by 183 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Overdue Overdue by 183 days
Annual return 31 July 2021 Overdue Overdue by 548 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Overdue Overdue by 548 days
Annual return 31 July 2020 19 October 2021 141 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 19 October 2021 141 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 30 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 30 May 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 28 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 28 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window