Financial history MERMAIDS

Charity number: 1160575
Regulatory alert
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £317.58k £715.33k £902.44k £1.85m £1.95m
Total expenditure £200.44k £406.70k £1.04m £1.18m £1.82m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £9.45k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £522.69k £666.11k £1.66m £1.66m
Income - Other trading activities N/A £36.30k £76.14k £72.33k £19.40k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £155.75k £159.00k £95.19k £201.13k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £586 £1.19k £575 £19.03k
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £22.77k £50.90k
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £240.14k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £406.70k £999.84k £1.10m £1.72m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £41.49k £80.82k £107.81k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £43.71k £261.83k £353.91k £450.32k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0